LAND OF OAK & IRON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the conservation, protection and enhancement of the natural, industrial and cultural heritage of the Land of Oak & Iron Advances the education of the general public in the natural, industrial and cultural heritage of the Land of Oak & Iron
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Northumberland
Governance
- 24 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bob James | Chair | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
MICHAEL TURNER | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Marion Fiona Schooler | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
GEOFF MARSHALL CENG MICE | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.10k | £3.72k | £1.44k | £5.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | £2.12k | £3.28k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE NATURAL, INDUSTRIAL AND CULTURAL HERITAGE OF THE LAND OF OAK & IRON TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE NATURAL, INDUSTRIAL AND CULTURAL HERITAGE OF THE LAND OF OAK & IRON
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 SPRINGHOUSE LANE
EBCHESTER
CONSETT
DH8 0QF
- Phone:
- 01207560555
- Email:
- finance@loit.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window