WEST KIRBY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSE OF THE SCHOOL FUND IS: TO PROVIDE ENHANCEMENT ACTIVITIES FOR THE STUDENTS AND SUPPORT FOR PARENTS IN FINANCIAL NEED. TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS BY DEVELOPING THE SCHOOL'S GROUNDS AND IMPROVING THE SCHOOL'S RESOURCES. THE FUND RECEIVES DONATIONS FROM PARENTS, PUPILS, STAFF AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. THE FUND MAKES DONATIONS TO CHOSEN CHARITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wirral
Governance
- 07 February 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Davidson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simeon Clarke | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANNE FAVAGER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.31k | £26.96k | £31.70k | £38.97k | £18.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.54k | £25.54k | £54.86k | £21.64k | £14.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 2 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FUND IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT WEST KIRBY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS BY PROVIDING AMENITIES AND FACILITIES WHICH ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, AND TO ASSIST NEEDY PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST KIRBY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FUND
GRAHAM ROAD
WEST KIRKBY
WIRRAL
CH48 5DP
- Phone:
- 01516323449
- Email:
- finance@wkgs.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window