SULIVAN PRIMARY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1186280
Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our PTA plans and hosts a variety of events every year to raise money for Sulivan Primary School. The majority of our events are held at the school and allow the parents, children, staff, and members of the wider community to engage in enriching activities whilst raising needed funds. The funds are then used to purchase educational books and toys, sports equipment, etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 17 July 2022

Total income: £6,265
Total expenditure: £4,794

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hammersmith And Fulham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cassie Lorenzo Chair 18 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/07/2020 17/07/2021 17/07/2022
Total gross income £5.04k £2.14k £6.27k
Total expenditure £3.16k £5.62k £4.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Accounts and TAR 17 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Annual return 17 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days
Accounts and TAR 17 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days
Annual return 17 July 2022 18 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 17 July 2021 18 March 2023 305 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 17 July 2020 07 June 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SULIVAN PRIMARY SCHOOL
PETERBOROUGH ROAD
LONDON
SW6 3BN
Phone:
02077365869
Website:

No information available