SCARBOROUGH TALKING NEWS FOR THE BLIND AND PARTIALLY-SIGHTED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly recording of local news for the blind and partially sighted. Occasional audio magazine also produced.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 April 1984: Standard registration
- SCARBOROUGH TALKING NEWS (Working name)
- SCARBOROUGH TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Grunwell Grunwell | Chair | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MARTIN JOHNSON | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Bulcock Bulcock | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Brown | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | 30/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220 | £9.54k | £1.03k | £1.59k | £8.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.21k | £1.53k | £4.68k | £3.06k | £5.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 DECEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 1983, 25 NOVEMBER 1985 AND 19 NOVEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY-SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46A HIGH STREET
SCALBY
SCARBOROUGH
YO13 0PS
- Phone:
- 01723368085
- Email:
- mary.grunwell@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
WWW.SCARBOROUGHTALKINGNEWS.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window