BOSTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1185777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. Through regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching; Supporting our community through community based activities eg coffee mornings, youth projects. etc

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £50,490
Total expenditure: £54,166

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adrian Went Trustee 27 February 2025
BOSTON BAPTIST TRUST
Received: On time
PATRICK CORKE Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Dr Jillian Massey Trustee 28 November 2019
None on record
Peter Meller Trustee 28 November 2019
None on record
Kevin Smithbone Trustee 28 November 2019
LINCOLNSHIRE YOUTH MISSION LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £60.43k £64.36k £76.51k £59.56k £50.49k
Total expenditure £57.34k £61.69k £72.58k £33.90k £54.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 08 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 08 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 April 2024 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 April 2024 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
98 HIGH STREET
BOSTON
PE21 8TA
Phone:
01205360049