WELTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church activities may include but are not restricted to: Regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching/teaching; Baptisms; Communion; Evangelism and mission, locally through to internationally; Teaching and encouragement of young people; Nurture and growth of Christian disciples; Training for Christian service; Pastoral care; Charitable social action; Working with other Christian churches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 25 February 2020: CIO registration
- 07 February 2024: Funds received from 1134013 WELTON BAPTIST CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James Kingswood | Chair | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Williamson | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE PETIT | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Green | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Bedrock | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Tim Hebditch | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Morven Munro | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Blowers | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Bruce Cooper | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Alan Coomes | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Bennett | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375.59k | £212.88k | £304.49k | £339.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £292.04k | £201.80k | £197.71k | £213.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 25 FEB 2020 AMENDED ON 02 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Welton Baptist Church
West Road
Midsomer Norton
RADSTOCK
BA3 2TP
- Phone:
- 01761410274
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window