Accounts and annual returns esperer

Charity Number: 1185437
Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 January 2022 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 January 2022 178 days late Download Open in new window