THE FELIX DENNIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1186113
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Regulatory alerts

  • Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
    The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
    Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
    Notice dated: 28 February 2025

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of Felix Dennis and other poets literary works to enhance education and creativity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mansurah Sheikh Talat Mannings Chair 24 September 2019
None on record
Donald Leslie Atyeo Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
Caroline Mary Rush Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 27 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 27 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 May 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 13 August 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 May 2024 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 13 August 2024 471 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 May 2024 746 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 13 August 2024 836 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 May 2024 1111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 13 August 2024 1201 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SIMONS MUIRHEAD AND BURTON
87-91 NEWMAN STREET
LONDON
W1T 3EY
Phone:
07767313190
Website:

No information available