Trustees FRIENDS OF WALLINGFORD AND CHOLSEY GREEN SPACES

Charity number: 1190055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Jayne Baker Chair 22 June 2020
None on record
Ceri Groves Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
Prof. Michael Charles Acreman Trustee 23 February 2024
None on record
Claire Churchill Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Dr Pete Sudbury Trustee 12 July 2020
None on record