CENTRE FOR ENABLING EA LEARNING & RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We assist people seeking to do the most good they can with their time and other resources, following the principles of Effective Altruism, by providing them with free or subsidised living arrangements including accommodation, board, stipend, to enable them to study, research, or work on charitable projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GREGORY HAMISH COLBOURN | Chair | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dusan Nesic | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Smith | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.22k | £154.65k | £184.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.63k | £132.76k | £196.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2021
(These accounts |
31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH IN ALL FIELDS OF ACADEMIC STUDY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE OR SUBSIDISED LIVING ACCOMMODATION TO THOSE UNDERTAKING SUCH LEARNING AND RESEARCH. 2. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFICIENT USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF EFFICIENT USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES. 3. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 YORK ST
BLACKPOOL
FY1 5AQ
- Phone:
- 07466372990
- Email:
- contact@ceealar.org
- Website:
-
ceealar.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window