SHEDDINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making and mending charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 19 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mark Aston | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brown | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Klein | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chris Manning | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Aras MRCGP | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.30k | £36.70k | £7.01k | £33.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.42k | £12.71k | £18.45k | £35.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.10k | £33.58k | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN TEDDINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED, UNEMPLOYED, BEREAVED, SOCIALLY ISOLATED OR HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL), THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL, RECREATIONAL OR LEARNING ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING PRACTICAL INTERESTS AND HOBBIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY AND HELP WITH COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Fairfax Road
Teddington
Middlesex
TW11 9DJ
- Phone:
- 07799 582337
- Email:
- admin@sheddington.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window