Governing document Ilkeston & District Centre For Voluntary Service, The Flamsteed Centre

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED ON THE 12 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 10 FEBRUARY 1998 AND 28 JUNE 2000, AMENDED BY SCHEME 27 MARCH 2001. as amended on 03 Mar 2000
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF ILKESTON AND DISTRICT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY TO BE ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ILKESTON AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.