RAINBOW BABY BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rainbow Baby Bank works towards the prevention or relief of poverty in the metropolitan borough of Kirklees. By providing items to Families, Mothers to be, other Charities & Organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty. The Charity distributes clothing, equipment and essential items to disadvantaged families. Also running a community hub offering help, signposting & group sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £14,465 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 03 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Lucy Surtees | Chair | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amel Bashford | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georg-Ann Walker | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.54k | £86.23k | £152.88k | £147.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.52k | £78.15k | £138.06k | £155.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.05k | N/A | £25.45k | £14.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN KIRKLEES AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING: ITEMS TO FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rainbow Baby Bank
19-21 Westgate
HECKMONDWIKE
West Yorkshire
WF16 0HE
- Phone:
- 01924694500
- Email:
- rainbowbabybank@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window