THE ANNE MATTHEWS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate Braich Goch; a residential learning centre, sanctuary space, and community hub for individuals & community groups working to combat the sources and effects of inequality, poverty, discrimination and oppression. We are especially committed to working with young adults from refugee and migrant backgrounds, to develop networks, access opportunities, and gain new skills and knowledge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £21,118 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- BRAICH GOCH-RED ARM CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Pearson | Chair | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andre Kpodonu | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Eden Lesley Yoha-Binti Lunghy | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Osian Morris | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jasber Singh | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.93k | £199.86k | £243.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.81k | £174.40k | £184.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.00k | £27.00k | £21.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2020 as amended on 05 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are, for the public benefit, in the United Kingdom and internationally: 1. To promote social inclusion by working with people who are socially excluded on the grounds of their ethnic origin or youth, and in particular but not exclusively young people from refugee and migrant backgrounds, and to relieve the needs of such people and assist them to integrate into society by: (a) providing recreational facilities and opportunities for such people. (b) enabling service providers to adapt their services to better meet the needs of such people. (c) raising public awareness of the issues affecting such people, both generally and in relation to their exclusion. 2. To develop the capacity and skills of the members of socially and economically disadvantaged communities, in particular but not exclusively refugee and migrant communities and those at risk of displacement, in such a way that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs and to participate more in society. 3. To promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of Corris and the surrounding area the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the condition of life of the said inhabitants. 4. To prevent and relieve need in those who have become or are at risk of becoming displaced persons or refugees from the countries of their origin or domicile by reason of hostilities, persecution, oppression, discrimination, natural disasters or other like causes, and their families and dependants who are in conditions of need, hardship and distress. 5. To promote sustainable development for the benefit of the public by: (a) the preservation, conservation and the protection of the environment and the prudent use of resources; (b) the relief of poverty and the improvement of the conditions of life in socially and economically disadvantaged communities; (c) the promotion of sustainable means of achieving economic growth and regeneration. Sustainable development means ?development which meets the needs of the present without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs.?
Contact information
- Address:
-
Braich Goch Inn & Bunkhouse
Corris
MACHYNLLETH
SY20 9RD
- Phone:
- 01654 761256
- Email:
- annematthewstrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window