WESTWARD PARISH ROOMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining and renting the former schoolroom, Westward, Cumbria
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £650 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 March 1984: Standard registration
- WESTWARD PARISH ROOM COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS M LITTLE | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR I JACKSON | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS J M ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £4.37k | £13.12k | £1.31k | £29.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.31k | £8.81k | £922 | £1.76k | £20.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.64k | N/A | £650 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED THE 2ND FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSE OF A PARISH ROOM FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WESTWARD IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTWARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NIGHTINGALES
CHURCH HILL
WESTWARD
WIGTON
CA7 8LZ
- Phone:
- 07514640319
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window