ANCHOR ANGLICAN CHURCH FOWEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to advance the Anglican Christian faith in Fowey by weekly church services & Bible teaching groups. We arrange Christian teaching & recreational activities for young people. We offer pastoral care to our members & our community through advice, visits and grants. We undertake mission & evangelism in Fowey & beyond. We provide grants to other Christian organisations in the UK & beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Oliver Patrick Ireland | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Tregonning | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP DE GREY-WARTER | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Guy Philip Torre Stickney | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.98k | £77.05k | £68.25k | £75.44k | £96.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.49k | £63.05k | £79.17k | £73.69k | £95.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1)TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX ANGLICAN EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF AND PRACTICE PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN FOWEY AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND (2)SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF AND PRACTICE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES FOR THE REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF AND PRACTICE AS MAY BE ADOPTED OR AMENDED BY THE CIO FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 7
20 Lostwithiel Street
FOWEY
Cornwall
PL23 1BE
- Phone:
- 07955877071
- Email:
- rector@anchorfowey.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window