KNOWLE AND DORRIDGE ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As part of the National Association of Round Tables, Knowle & Dorridge Round Table carries out its purpose through a nationally set standard approach adopted by all Round Tables in the UK. Round Table members meet twice a month for social activities, quarterly for business meetings, and annually for the AGM. We run three charity fundraisers annually; Dorridge Day, Santa float, K&D Drinks Festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Solihull
Governance
- 09 October 2019: Standard registration
- KNOWLE AND DORRIDGE ROUND TABLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mabon | Chair | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Mackay | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Wills | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Faulkner | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gray | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.48k | £56.20k | £51.06k | £42.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.32k | £42.47k | £39.14k | £53.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HEREBY DECLARE THAT THEY SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME OR ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF AND THE INCOME ARISING THEREFROM OR ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND & WALES AND OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES TRUSTS ASSOCIATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE OR SELECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ROUND TABLES
MARCHESI HOUSE
4 EMBASSY DRIVE
EDGBASTON
BIRMINGHAM
B15 1TP
- Phone:
- 01214564567
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window