Financial history WORCESTERSHIRE ANIMAL RESCUE SHELTER

Charity number: 514872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £210.28k £158.12k £220.30k £346.46k £252.55k
Total expenditure £219.25k £213.48k £193.32k £260.94k £293.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.56k
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k N/A £500 N/A