ORMSKIRK FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of emergency food, essential toiletries and household items to individuals and families in need in Ormskirk and the surrounding area. Provision of other support for the relief of financial hardship such as signposting to relevant information and other advisory services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 24 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Fallows | Chair | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Smith | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Conway | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette King | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK HUDSON | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Linda Heaton | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Jones | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Chalk | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.93k | £30.79k | £32.73k | £24.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.03k | £16.78k | £25.34k | £36.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN ORMSKIRK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES AND TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, SUPPORTED BY CHURCHES IN ORMSKIRK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW CHURCH HOUSE
CHURCH STREET
ORMSKIRK
L39 3RD
- Phone:
- 07748951274
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window