MY LIFE MY CHOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an independent, user-led charity where all 15 trustees have a learning disability, and with members from across Oxfordshire. As well as promoting choice, empowerment and participation, we provide volunteering, training, social and paid work opportunities that combat isolation and lead to more fulfilling lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £117,347 from 4 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 February 2020: CIO registration
- 01 November 2021: Funds received from 1073247 OXFORDSHIRE MY LIFE MY CHOICE ASSOCIATION
- MLMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Anne Bowerman | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bebbington | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Lloyd | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam Payne | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Eyre | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Anne Mileham | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Law | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anup Upadhyaya | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Roy Chappell | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith David Filleul | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Joseph McCay | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Edwards | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Susan Mansfield | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £651.73k | £522.59k | £433.66k | £451.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.50k | £395.95k | £435.76k | £542.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £91.21k | £141.19k | £129.35k | £117.35k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £254.72k | £293 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £395.21k | £520.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.80k | £2.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £322.17k | £395.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £325 | £83 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.00k | £2.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVOCACY AND ASSOCIATED SUPPORT, IN ORDER FOR THEM TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 3
Watlington House
Watlington Road
Cowley
OXFORD
OX4 6NF
- Phone:
- 01865204214
- Email:
- bryan@mylifemychoice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window