SOUTHSIDE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community based charity that focuses on the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith primarily but not exclusively within Thornton Heath and the surrounding neighbourhood; and such other charitable purposes such as helping those in need as shall, in the opinion of the Managing Trustees further the work of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 08 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Prescod | Trustee | 14 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stace | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.33k | £43.96k | £55.00k | £56.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.78k | £39.16k | £60.10k | £44.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR RESIDENTS WITHIN THORNTON HEATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF GREATER LONDON; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Westbrook Road
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8PS
- Phone:
- 07306569084
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window