MIDZI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to protect the good health and well-being of women and girls, particularly, but not exclusively, concerning all areas of female reproductive and sexual health including but not exclusively by: The provision of educational outreach programmes, materials and other forms of information; and Providing support to attend conferences, workshops and exchange programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Malawi
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 15 June 2020: CIO registration
- ROOTS UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clarisa Regina Rumbidzai Regede | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacob Berkson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BEATRICE SAVADYE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £1.02k | £2.04k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.48k | £985 | £1.91k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF WOMEN AND GIRLS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CONCERNING ALL AREAS OF FEMALE REPRODUCTIVE AND SEXUAL HEALTH INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL OUTREACH PROGRAMMES, MATERIALS AND OTHER FORMS OF INFORMATION; AND · PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ATTEND CONFERENCES, WORKSHOPS AND EXCHANGE PROGRAMMES 2)TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOMEN AND GIRLS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED, OR ARE AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING, SEXUAL AND GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND ACCESS TO SUPPORT STRUCTURES TO ASSIST WOMEN AND GIRLS LIVE DIGNIFIED LIVES FREE FROM VIOLENCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEACROFT
EAST BRACKLESHAM DRIVE
BRACKLESHAM BAY
CHICHESTER
PO20 8JW
- Phone:
- 07950937469
- Email:
- rootsuk@rootsafrica.net
- Website:
-
midzi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window