TURTLE FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Turtle Foundation is a dedicated international volunteer effort with project sites in Indonesia & Cape Verde, cooperating with local communities to create a future where both sea turtles and people can thrive. We aim to prevent endangered sea turtles from becoming extinct due to the threats of poaching, the looting of turtle nests and destruction of their ecosystem by the expansion of tourism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cape Verde
- Indonesia
Governance
- 07 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Logan | Chair | 07 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Christophe Eizaguirre | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof Dr Otto Jockel | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Logan | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £459 | £17.56k | £19.81k | £14.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £14.25k | £21.10k | £16.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF SEA TURTLES AND THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT GENERALLY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING: (A) WORKING TO STOP THE COMMERCIAL EXPLOITATION OF TURTLES; (B) DELIVERING CONCRETE PROJECTS THROUGH ON-THE-SPOT ASSISTANCE TO PREVENT THE LARGEST POSSIBLE NUMBER OF TURTLE NESTS FROM PLUNDERING AND ADULT ANIMALS FROM SLAUGHTER; (C) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE LONG-TERM ENVIRONMENTAL VALUE OF A HEALTHY POPULATION OF TURTLES AND THE PROBLEM OF THE COMMERCIAL PLUNDER OF TURTLE NESTS WITH THE PUBLIC AND WITH GOVERNMENTS AND PUBLIC AUTHORITIES; D) PROMOTING ALTERNATIVES FOR COMMUNITIES DEPENDENT ON THE TRADE IN TURTLES OR THEIR PRODUCTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 MEDWAY ROAD
LONDON
E3 5BY
- Phone:
- 02089818278
- Email:
- info@turtle-foundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window