KHS FRIENDS

Charity number: 1185472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

KHS Friends aim is to develop effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with Kirkleatham Hall Special School, based in Redcar in the North East of England. Also to engage in activities or provide facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 18 June 2024

Total income: £4,655
Total expenditure: £7,324

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Redcar And Cleveland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Louise Learman Chair 18 June 2019
None on record
Jennifer Shanley Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
Kim Quine Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Simmone Thompson Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/06/2020 18/06/2021 18/06/2022 18/06/2023 18/06/2024
Total gross income £4.78k £1.54k £2.07k £11.07k £4.66k
Total expenditure £899 £787 £1.67k £4.91k £7.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 June 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 18 June 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 18 June 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 18 June 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 June 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KIRKLEATHAM HALL SCHOOL
KIRKLEATHAM
REDCAR
TS10 4QR
Phone:
01642483009
Website:

No information available