THE MEL EVANS MBE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Health particularly the research of Motor Neuron disease
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Pritchatt | Chair | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sydney Cairns | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Woodcock | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Cook | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ellis | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.65k | £24.52k | £42.42k | £77.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £360 | £9.46k | £46.89k | £72.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HEALTH THROUGH FUNDING AND SUPPORT OF MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH PARTICULARLY RE MOTOR NEURONE DISEASE. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF BOWLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Waterlily Close
CANNOCK
WS12 2GN
- Phone:
- 07808157878
- Email:
- Lpritchatt@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window