FRIENDS OF PEVENSEY AND WESTHAM SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The raising of funds to ensure the highest enrichment for the children and community surrounding Pevensey and Westham school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 12 November 2019: Standard registration
- PAWS PFT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hilton | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Dann | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Andrew | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £1.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2022 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pevensey & Westham C of E Primary S
86 High Street
Westham
PEVENSEY
BN24 5LP
- Phone:
- 07359046165
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window