LANCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates from Lanchester Community Centre. Affiliated groups, organisations and individuals hire use of the premises to offer educational and leisure activities to promote the wellbeing of the inhabitants of Lanchester and the wider community. A fitness centre is available for monthly subscription which includes an induction session.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £40,625 from 9 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 06 April 2020: CIO registration
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 520840 LANCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glenda Horne | Chair | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Rimmington-Kane | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Martin | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marian Morrison | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Collins | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Hammond | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Garry Smith | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Madelaine Williams | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Fox | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barrie McDermid | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.12k | £77.18k | £66.52k | £125.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.66k | £74.36k | £55.67k | £121.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.13k | £36.60k | £6.90k | £40.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LANCHESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF LANCHESTER (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANCHESTER COMMUNITY CENTRE
NEWBIGGEN LANE
LANCHESTER
DURHAM
DH7 0PB
- Phone:
- 01207521275
- Website:
-
lanchestercc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window