TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH CENTRAL DRIVE BLACKPOOL INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church is open for public worship 10.45am. for many years we have supported many Christian projects with donations in Mozanbique, Ghana and Burma and a Christian radio station in the middle east. Our schoolroom has been used to raise money for McMillian and various Christian and none Christian Charities and we receive request for money on Sunday. The schoolroom is available on request
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 January 2020: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 254007 THE INDEPENDENT METHODIST ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATE...
- IM CHURCH BLACKPOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £3.32k | £1.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.86k | £5.26k | £4.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE INDEPENDENT METHODIST CONNEXION. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window