Trustees BELMONT ABBEY GENERAL CIO
Charity number: 1190035

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Right Reverend Keith Brendan Martel Thomas OSB | Chair | 22 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Dom Paul Keith Dunstan Nelson | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Thomas Carney OSB | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
FATHER DAVID JAMES ALEXANDER KENYON | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Leo Thomas Augustine Primavesi | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Michael Irwin Evans OSB | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.