Trustees TWO MILE ASH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1186248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Dyer Chair 01 March 2023
None on record
Isabella Joyce Trustee 21 March 2023
None on record
Natasha Cheriyan Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Rachel Burnside Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Gemma Hill Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Kelly Garner Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Susan Mitchell Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record
Tracy Fenton Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record