MOVE MOMENTUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Move Momentum is a dance charity based in Winchester, Hampshire that provides classes that are accessible, inclusive and affordable for everyone. We focus on supporting mental and physical well-being and enriching people's quality of life. Our main beneficiaries are young people, older adults and people with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 April 2020: CIO registration
- MOMENTUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Charlotte Girling | Chair | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Bignell | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Plummer | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Francis Brown | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Sims | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harry Newton | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stephen Hollinghurst | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/04/2021 | 14/04/2022 | 14/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.68k | £53.92k | £64.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.05k | £38.80k | £74.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £940 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ARTS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL DANCE CLASSES FOR DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN, PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, PEOPLE IN ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) AND THE ELDERLY IN WINCHESTER, HAMPSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 12
WINNALL VALLEY ROAD
WINCHESTER
SO23 0LD
- Phone:
- 01962809234
- Email:
- info@movemomentum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window