THE HEAD TO TOE CLUBFOOT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help to support those affected with lower limb differences (LLDs) using our social media platforms. We raise funds and awareness for our charity through local art projects. We promote art and culture, inclusivity, well-being and mental health support. We aim to provide a variety of workshops, classes and exhibitions for our local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 2020: CIO registration
- The Head to Toe Lower Limb Charity (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Klaire Harvey | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Burns Jane | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Tait | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £828 | £1.53k | £2.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £828 | £1.37k | £2.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 June 2024 | 484 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH LOWER LIMB DEFORMITIES, CTEV (CONGENITAL TALIPES EQUINOVARUS) MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS CLUBFOOT, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, THROUGH: THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT GROUPS AND SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE AND INFORMATION AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT WITH THE AIM OF FACILITATING THE BEST POSSIBLE CARE OF SUCH PERSONS; AND UNDERTAKING AND FUNDING RESEARCH INTO LOWER LIMB DEFORMITIES, CTEV AND THEIR CONNECTED COMORBIDITIES, INCLUDING THE IMPACT ON THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING WITH SUCH CONDITIONS, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
119-121 Broadway West
LEIGH-ON-SEA
Essex
SS9 2BU
- Phone:
- 07411572876
- Email:
- Head2toe@email.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window