NEWPORT PHAB CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities encourage people who are disabled to intergrate with non disabled on an equal platform. We annually attend Rotary Sports Days. An annual holiday to Butlins, Minehead and occassional trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newport City
Governance
- 08 March 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Smart | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hickey | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Heath | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANDRESS | Trustee | 20 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/02/2020 | 12/02/2021 | 12/02/2022 | 12/02/2023 | 12/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £2.71k | £4.70k | £3.65k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.79k | £1.36k | £4.14k | £2.04k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 February 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 February 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 February 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 February 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 February 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 16 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF NEWPORT, GWENT, BY BRINGING SUCH PERSONS INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION WITH ABLE-BODIED PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NEWPORT, GWENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 ELGAR AVENUE
NEWPORT
NP19 9SU
- Phone:
- 07722547327
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window