XENIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Migrant women learning English (sometimes called learners) attend welcoming workshops alongside other fluent English speaking women (sometimes called speakers). These weekly workshops currently take place in community spaces in London, primarily delivered in partnership with the Hackney Museum. Travel expenses and childcare are provided for women in need of them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,086 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 April 2020: CIO registration
- XENIA WOMEN (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lelah Palmer | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jones | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Brook | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lois Simes | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Plimmer | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Samantha Shaw | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.66k | £83.36k | £102.21k | £123.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.88k | £63.80k | £71.45k | £101.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.00k | £12.48k | £23.03k | £19.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST WOMEN IN THE UK WHO MAY BE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR GENDER, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED, EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT, PARENTAL SITUATION, MARITAL STATUS, IMMIGRATION STATUS OR LANGUAGE ABILITY, TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: • PROVIDING A NETWORK GROUP WHICH ENCOURAGES AND ASSISTS WOMEN TO DEVELOP THEIR ABILITY TO COMMUNICATE IN ENGLISH, BUILDS CONFIDENCE AND ENABLES THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY; • RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING SUCH WOMEN GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Hackney Museum
1 Reading Lane
London
E8 1GQ
- Phone:
- 07835277776
- Email:
- welcome@xenia.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window