BISHOP AUCKLAND TABLE TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity holds a range of Table tennis sessions for all age and abilities. Using the local area to launch outreach sessions in primary and secondary schools, and working with local organisations to set up sessions for any programme involving Table tennis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £5,200 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 08 October 2019: CIO registration
- BATTC (Working name)
- BISHOP AUCKLAND TTC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hannan | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Wansbury | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bailey Pye | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TABLE TENNIS FOR THE COMMUNITY OF BISHOP AUCKLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BISHOP BARRINGTON ACADEMY
WOODHOUSE LANE
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL14 6LA
- Phone:
- 07772828236
- Email:
- ryan@bishopaucklandttc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window