RIASAT OSMAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Purpose of establishing the CIO is to work together to serve ALL deprived beings (human and animals), across the world by providing the necessities of food, clothing and shelter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 04 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
QASAM ALI KHAN | Chair | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
NAZIR KHAN | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
FAUZIA KHAN | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/12/2020 | 12/12/2021 | 12/12/2022 | 12/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.40k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS HAVE BEEN AMENDED TO THE FOLLOWING · TO PROMOTE HUMAN BEHAVIOR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH NEED CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS,MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. · THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND WHERE REQUIRED FINANCIAL HARDSHIP UK (ENGLAND & WALES, PAKISTAN AND AFRICA) BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION,TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. · THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN UK (ENGLAND & WALES, PAKISTAN AND AFRICA) BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OROTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
IN UK (ENGLAND & WALES, PAKISTAN AND AFRICA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manchester
Lancashire
BL9 9GE
- Phone:
- 01616255257
- Email:
- Qas.a7@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window