THE AUSTIN BAILEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting local activities of churches of the Christian faith. Assisting local charities or local branches of national charities. Relief of poverty in the poor countries of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 07 March 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Vernon Austin Bailey | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ashraf Sourour Ishaksourour Mikhail | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Norton | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ruth Goldstone | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
JAMES ADAM LEACH | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Steven Buting | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA JO MORTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £367.44k | £143.82k | £118.51k | £165.94k | £200.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £242.18k | £143.95k | £153.59k | £163.08k | £193.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
(I) APPROXIMATELY 25% OF THE ANNUAL INCOME IS TO BE USED TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY ASSISTING THE LOCAL ACTIVITY OF THE CHURCHES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO BE USED FOR SPECIAL AND DESERVING WORK OF APPEALS INCLUDING HELP FOR THE POOR BUT NOT FOR THE DAY TO DAY RUNNING OF THE CHURCH OR CHURCHES.(II) APPROXIMATELY 25% OF THE ANNUAL INCOME IS TO BE USED BY RELIEF AGENTS FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING HELP FOR POOR COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD.(III) THE REMAINING APPROXIMATE 50% OF THE ANNUAL INCOME IS TO BE USED FOR LOCAL CHARITIES OR THE LOCAL BRANCHES OF NATIONAL CHARITIES FOR THE HELP OF THOSE WHO ARE DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR AGED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Onslow Square
Flat 4
London
SW7 3NJ
- Phone:
- 07768081757
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window