SLEEP POD

Charity Number: 1187295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We make sleep pods for rough sleepers and raise money to support such activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £52,720
Total expenditure: £71,491

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • France

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
pete kenyon-holt Chair 10 January 2020
None on record
Ian Ashby Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Angharad Halliday Trustee 10 January 2020
None on record
CRIPPS TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED Trustee 10 January 2020
THE DOWLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE OVERSTALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BRIGHTON AND HOVE ESTATES CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE DAVID AND DEBORAH STILEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HOTEL SCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £119.25k £94.91k £51.04k £52.72k
Total expenditure £117.43k £90.79k £37.57k £71.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 May 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 May 2024 107 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cripps Pemberton Greenish
Number 22
Mount Ephraim
Tunbridge Wells
Kent
Tn48as
Phone:
01732224011