Parley Community Pre School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide preschool education for the children in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 October 2019: CIO registration
- 12 July 2021: Funds received from 1041174 LONGHAM COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL
- LONGHAM COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Tanner | Chair | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amy Billinge | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan oliver Hook | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Doherty | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mcdonald | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Louise MacQueen | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £26.20k | £83.00k | £115.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £33.44k | £88.43k | £103.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Oct 2019 as amended on 25 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parley Sports & Social Club - PARLEY PRE SCHOOL
275 Christchurch Road
West Parley
FERNDOWN
Dorset
BH22 8SQ
- Phone:
- 01202578436
- Email:
- longhampreschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window