Accounts and annual returns SHARESHILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 514928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 24 March 2025 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 24 March 2025 724 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 24 March 2025 1089 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1509 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1509 days