Trustees GLOSSOP MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity number: 1186862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian David Bennett Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Christopher Michael Gregory Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Gregory Blake Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Nigel John Hackney Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Patrick Benjamin Haley Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Timothy Thomas Budd Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Darren Peter Hodkinson Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record