Financial history THE BUCKS ASSOCIATION FOR THE CARE OF OFFENDERS

Charity Number: 1186375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £69.12k £16.78k £27.29k £50.34k £93.53k
Total expenditure £26.00k £30.02k £21.89k £56.18k £45.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.25k N/A £5.00k N/A £5.00k