SIRLUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sirlute CIO, is a charity that provides educational music programmes up to the age of 25 from disadvantaged backgrounds. Delivering music workshops, artist development & work experience to counter youth violence and risk-taking behaviour. Sirlute is youth led, workshops and learning are co designed by industry professionals, community leaders & our beneficiaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 March 2020: CIO registration
- PEPPER ST. STUDIO (Working name)
- SIRLUTE THE KING (Working name)
- SIRLUTE THE QUEEN (Working name)
- SIRLUTE THE YOUNGSTAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saba Kia | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin James Robinson | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Williams | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/01/2021 | 13/01/2022 | 13/01/2023 | 13/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.87k | £65.38k | £72.15k | £89.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.94k | £80.51k | £74.37k | £87.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 January 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 January 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 January 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN LONDON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arebyte
21 City Island Way
LONDON
E14 0QE
- Phone:
- 020 74594784
- Email:
- info@sirlute.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window