BOXES OF BASICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FOOD PACKAGES AND/OR GRANTS OF MONEY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
USHER MANN | Chair | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raizel Stern | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yosef Goldberg | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.85k | £136.48k | £84.45k | £80.61k | £121.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.98k | £199.35k | £65.65k | £56.16k | £60.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FOOD PACKAGES AND/OR GRANTS OF MONEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Avenue Road
London
N15 5JG
- Phone:
- 02088008833
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window