KIRKLEES HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A building preservation trust: Buying historic buildings in need of repair, carrying out the repair and selling to be able to buy the next one.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 27 March 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR ANDREW CHARLES PINNOCK | Chair |
|
||||||
CLLR BEVERLEY DAWN ADDY | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Moses Crook | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David James Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Councillor Cathy Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Gwenneth Lowe | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308 | £43 | £40 | £980 | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.01k | £7.91k | £9.76k | £865 | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE BOROUGH OF KIRKLEES AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE BOROUGH OF KIRKLEES AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST, OR ANCIENT MONUMENTS AND TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE STUDY OF THE SAID HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE AND TO MAKE THE INFORMATION OBTAINED AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF KIRKLEES AND THE NATION AT LARGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cedars
Dorney Wood Road
Burnham
SLOUGH
SL1 8EJ
- Phone:
- 07855304299
- Email:
- john@jjmace.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window