PHOENIX DANCE & GYMNASTICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phoenix Dance & Gymnastics is a recreational and competitive gymnastics club, we cater for all ages from 3 upwards with many different classes catering for the community. The club is registered with British and Welsh Gymnastics allowing gymnasts to participate in governing body schemes such as Proficiency Award Testing and Leadership Academies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 06 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire James | Chair | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Harris | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura James | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rolls | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.80k | £53.06k | £140.35k | £216.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.63k | £77.44k | £136.08k | £220.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 May 2023 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS AND RESIDENT IN THE RHONDDA CYNON TAFF ARE OF WALES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND INSTRUCTION IN GYMNASTICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 6
Cwmbach
Aberdare
CF44 0AG
- Phone:
- 07815838212
- Email:
- cj.phoenixdgc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
phoenixdgc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window