JUSTIFY UK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides financial support to citizens whose rights have been violated and who otherwise could not pursue justice via the courts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 2020: CIO registration
- THE JUSTICE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Whiteley Mr | Chair | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Attila Angus Aziz Kent | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Anna Fiorentini | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.13k | £0 | £35 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.89k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY ASSISTING WITH THE FUNDING OF THE PROVISION OF LEGAL ADVICE, SERVICES AND ADVOCACY WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE ACCESS THESE THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 WOOLGROVE ROAD
HITCHIN
SG4 0AU
- Phone:
- 07710547037
- Email:
- Justice@innogise.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window