Virtual Routes Community

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of Virtual Routes Community (formerly the European Cyber Conflict Research Initiative or ECCRI) advance education for the public benefit regarding cyber conflict and statecraft, including by promoting the study of cyber conflict and related issues, and by collaborating with other entities on cyber conflict studies. Virtual Routes Community is based in the UK and operates worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £50,400 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Switzerland
Governance
- 10 August 2020: CIO registration
- ECCRI (Working name)
- EUROPEAN CYBER CONFLICT RESEARCH INITIATIVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Max Willem Eline Smeets | Chair | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jasmin Stadler | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR JAMES SHIRES | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Monica Kaminska | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.59k | £39.77k | £119.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £30.79k | £86.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £50.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Aug 2020 as amended on 25 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN RELATION TO CYBER CONFLICT AND STATECRAFT INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION): (1) PROMOTING THE STUDY AND/OR FACILITATING THE INFORMED ANALYSIS OF ISSUES SUCH AS NATIONAL CYBER STRATEGIES, TECHNOLOGIES USED FOR CONDUCTING AND DEFENDING AGAINST CYBER ATTACKS, PRIVATE-PUBLIC SECTOR PARTNERSHIPS AND REGIONAL COOPERATION TO PREVENT OR REDUCE CYBER CONFLICT; AND/OR (2) PROMOTING AN UNDERSTANDING OF CYBER CONFLICT AND STATECRAFT; AND/OR (3) ESTABLISHING ARRANGEMENTS FOR COLLABORATION IN RESPECT OF CYBER CONFLICT STUDIES, MENTORING AND RESEARCH WITH AND/OR BETWEEN NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL UNIVERSITIES (AND COLLEGES, FACULTIES AND DEPARTMENTS WITHIN THEM), THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UK AND OTHER NATIONS, NON-GOVERNMENTAL NON-PROFIT BODIES AND OTHER SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED WITH SUCH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Boutport Street
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 1SQ
- Phone:
- 01271374138
- Email:
- admin@eccri.eu
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window