MILLIMETRES 2 MOUNTAINS FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Millimetres to Mountains aim is to be the catalyst for positive change in people facing challenges in life. Through discovery and adventure we provide a platform for individuals to redefine their own limitations and take steps towards a brighter future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- M2M FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Euan Craig | Chair | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Serena Monique Kersten MBE | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Myers | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Stirling | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Craig Summers | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Barkley | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Jackson | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Freya Dawson | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.35k | £112.08k | £259.45k | £190.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.46k | £80.87k | £186.38k | £224.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2023 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2023 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR DISABILITY BY PROVIDING GRANT FUNDING TO ENABLE THEM PARTAKE IN OUTDOOR CHALLENGES AND TRIPS WHICH ASSIST THEIR RECOVERY. 2) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Lias
Loves Hill
Timsbury
BATH
BA2 0EU
- Phone:
- 07398870008
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window