THE ALVA WEST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provisions of playing, training and coaching in various sports in particular football. To assist less advantaged youths and adults from Jamaica and other countries providing them with recreational visits to and from England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Jamaica
Governance
- 09 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WEST | Chair | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS MICHAEL ROSE | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLINTON WEST | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ANDREW ROSE | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE OVER 18 FROM JAMAICA AND OTHER COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOOTBALL, PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 6
POPLARS INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
REDDITCH ROAD
STUDLEY
B80 7AY
- Phone:
- 07976896991
- Email:
- paul@wexco.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window